US HB5603 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Introduced on April 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 579.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 579.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Access to Telehealth Services for Substance Use Disorders Act This bill authorizes the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services to waive certain requirements with respect to payment for telehealth services provided to a Medicare beneficiary who is receiving treatment for a substance-use disorder or a co-occurring mental-health disorder.
Title
Access to Telehealth Services for Substance Use Disorders Act
Sponsors
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] | Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI] |
Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 579. |
2018-06-12 | House | Committee on Ways and Means discharged. |
2018-06-12 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-745, Part I. |
2018-05-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-05-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-05-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-04-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR949 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR949 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Drug therapy
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health information and medical records
Health technology, devices, supplies
Medicare
Mental health
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health information and medical records
Health technology, devices, supplies
Medicare
Mental health