US HB5587 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-14 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-14 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Strengthening Career and Technical Education for the 21st Century Act This bill reauthorizes through FY2022 the Carl D. Perkins Career and Technical Education Act of 2006, divides career and technical education (CTE) students into CTE concentrators and CTE participants, and revises requirements for within-state funding allocations. The bill also revises requirements for core indicators of performance, including state adjusted levels of performance, to differentiate those for CTE concentrators who graduate from high school and for CTE concentrators at the postsecondary level. The Institute for Education Sciences shall act for the Department of Education (ED) to appoint the independent advisory panel on the evaluation of CTE programs. The bill revises requirements for the contents of an evaluation. ED may award grants to eligible entities, including local educational agencies and area CTE schools, to: create, develop, implement, or take to scale evidence-based, field initiated innovations, including through a pay for success initiative to improve CTE student outcomes; and evaluate such innovations rigorously. The bill reauthorizes through FY2022 grants for tribally controlled CTE institutions, and repeals the authorization for assistance for certain occupational and information activities. State plans shall be for four years instead of six years. The bill revises requirements for: such plans as well as state program improvement plans and state leadership activities; local applications for CTE programs, including a comprehensive CTE needs assessment, and local uses of funds; and state maintenance of efforts, including administrative penalties for failure to meet maintenance requirements. The bill repeals the separate mandate for tech prep education. The Government Accountability Office shall evaluate: the strategies, components, policies, and practices used by eligible agencies or eligible recipients receiving funding to assist successfully all students in pursuing and completing programs of study aligned to high-skill, high-wage occupations, as well as any specific underrepresented subgroup of students; and any challenges associated with replication of such strategies, components, policies, and practices. The Wagner-Peyser Act is amended to revise the duties of a state agency receiving federal assistance for participation in the nationwide employment statistics system of workforce and labor market information.
Title
Strengthening Career and Technical Education for the 21st Century Act
Sponsors
Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] | Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] | Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA] |
Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Richard Nolan [D-MN] | Rep. John Kline [R-MN] | Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] |
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] |
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] | Rep. Mike Bishop [R-MI] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] |
Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] |
Rep. Brad Ashford [D-NE] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Joseph Heck [R-NV] | Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] |
Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. David Scott [D-GA] |
Rep. Martha Roby [R-AL] | Rep. Ryan Costello [R-PA] |
Roll Calls
House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 405 N: 5 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 405 N: 5 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 405 N: 5 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2016-09-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-09-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 405 - 5 (Roll no. 503). (text: CR H5365-5375) |
2016-09-13 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5386) |
2016-09-13 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2016-09-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5587. |
2016-09-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5365-5380) |
2016-09-13 | House | Mr. Thompson (PA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-09-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 564. |
2016-09-08 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 114-728. |
2016-07-07 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 37 - 0. |
2016-07-07 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-06-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2016-06-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Academic performance and assessments
Census and government statistics
Congressional oversight
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Employment and training programs
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Indian social and development programs
Labor and employment
Performance measurement
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Vocational and technical education
Census and government statistics
Congressional oversight
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Employment and training programs
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Indian social and development programs
Labor and employment
Performance measurement
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Vocational and technical education