US HB5574 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To require the TSA to develop a plan to ensure that TSA material disseminated in major airports can be better understood by more people accessing such airports, and for other purposes.
Title
TRANSLATE Act TSA Reaching Across Nationalities, Societies, and Languages to Advance Traveler Education Act
Sponsors
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2021-11-18 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 369 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2021-11-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-11-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 369 - 49 (Roll no. 381). (text: 11/16/2021 CR H6296) |
2021-11-18 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6597-6598) |
2021-11-16 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-11-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5574. |
2021-11-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6296-6297) |
2021-11-16 | House | Ms. Titus moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2021-10-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2021-10-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-10-26 | House | Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security Discharged. |
2021-10-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security. |
2021-10-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2021-10-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3296 (Related) 2022-12-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 626.
HB7776 (Related) 2022-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 117-263.
HB7776 (Related) 2022-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 117-263.