US HB5567 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Federal Communications Commission to consider market entry barriers for socially disadvantaged individuals in its biennial communications marketplace report.
Title
MEDIA Diversity Act of 2020 Measuring the Economics Driving Investments and Access for Diversity Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Billy Long [R-MO] | Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] | Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2020-09-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4613) |
2020-09-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5567. |
2020-09-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4613-4614) |
2020-09-21 | House | Mr. McNerney moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2020-09-18 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 423. |
2020-09-18 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-523. |
2020-07-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2020-07-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-03-10 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2020-03-10 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-01-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2020-01-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2020-01-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Competition and antitrust
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Government information and archives
Internet and video services
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
Television and film
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Competition and antitrust
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Government information and archives
Internet and video services
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
Television and film