US HB5538 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to provide for the inclusion of certain additional periods of active duty service for purposes of suspending charges to veterans' entitlement to educational assistance under the laws administered by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs during periods of suspended participation in vocational rehabilitation programs. (Sec. 1) This bill provides that veterans participating in a Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) vocational rehabilitation program who are unable to complete the program because they are called to active reserve duty for a preplanned training operation in support of a combat command or in response to a natural disaster or emergency shall not have the period of the program for which they did not get credit count toward their VA assistance limit.
Title
To amend title 38, United States Code, to provide for the inclusion of certain additional periods of active duty service for purposes of suspending charges to veterans' entitlement to educational assistance under the laws administered by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs during periods of suspended participation in vocational rehabilitation programs.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] | Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] | Rep. Beto O'Rourke [D-TX] |
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Bruce Poliquin [R-ME] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] |
Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2018-07-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-07-24 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7133-7134) |
2018-07-24 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5538. |
2018-07-24 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7133-7134) |
2018-07-24 | House | Mr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-07-24 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 673. |
2018-07-24 | House | Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-870. |
2018-07-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2018-07-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-05-23 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2018-04-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2018-04-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2018-04-17 | House | Introduced in House |