US HB5535 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit the Federal Insurance Office of the Department of the Treasury and other financial regulators from collecting data directly from an insurance company.
Title
Insurance Data Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Fitzgerald [R-WI] | Rep. Mike Flood [R-NE] | Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Rep. Byron Donalds [R-FL] |
Rep. Barry Moore [R-AL] | Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL] | Rep. Monica De La Cruz [R-TX] | Rep. Jerry Carl [R-AL] |
Rep. Dale Strong [R-AL] | Rep. Bryan Steil [R-WI] | Rep. Andrew Garbarino [R-NY] | Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL] |
Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] | Rep. Harriet Hageman [R-WY] | Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] |
Rep. William Timmons [R-SC] | Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] |
Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] | Rep. Zachary Nunn [R-IA] | Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] | Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA] |
Rep. John Rose [R-TN] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 22. |
2024-04-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-09-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Markets, Digital Assets, and Rural Development. |
2023-09-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-09-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3349 (Related) 2024-01-25 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/5535/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr5535/BILLS-118hr5535ih.pdf |