US HB5525 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-21 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 207 - 143 (Roll no. 334).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-21 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 207 - 143 (Roll no. 334).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
End Taxpayer Funded Cell Phones Act of 2016 This bill prohibits a provider of commercial mobile service or commercial mobile data service from receiving universal service support under the Communications Act of 1934 through the Federal Communications Commission's (FCC's) Lifeline program, which provides subsidies for discounts on monthly telephone or broadband service (e.g., Internet service on mobile phones) to qualifying low-income consumers. The FCC must continue to collect universal service contributions from telecommunications carriers through 2017 based on mobile service support provided in 2016 despite the bill's prohibition on Lifeline universal service support for mobile services. But the amounts collected for mobile services must be deposited in the Treasury for deficit reduction instead of being distributed for universal service support.
Title
End Taxpayer Funded Cell Phones Act of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] | Rep. Dave Brat [R-VA] |
Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Mick Mulvaney [R-SC] | Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-21 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 207 N: 143 NV: 84 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 207 - 143 (Roll no. 334). |
2016-06-21 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4025) |
2016-06-21 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2016-06-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5525. |
2016-06-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3978-3983; text of measure as introduced: CR H3978-3979) |
2016-06-21 | House | Mr. Scott, Austin moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2016-06-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2016-06-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB266 (Related) 2015-01-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
SB1621 (Related) 2015-06-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB1621 (Related) 2015-06-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Budget deficits and national debt
Science, technology, communications
Telecommunication rates and fees
Telephone and wireless communication
Science, technology, communications
Telecommunication rates and fees
Telephone and wireless communication