US HB266 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
End Taxpayer Funded Cell Phones Act of 2015 Prohibits a provider of commercial mobile service or commercial mobile data service from receiving universal service support under specified provisions of the Communications Act of 1934 for the provision of such service through the Federal Communications Commission's Lifeline program that provides discounts on monthly telephone service to qualifying low-income consumers.
Title
End Taxpayer Funded Cell Phones Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] | Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Billy Long [R-MO] |
Rep. John Carter [R-TX] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] |
Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Jim Jordan [R-OH] | Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] | Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] |
Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD] | Rep. Tom Graves [R-GA] | Rep. Lynn Westmoreland [R-GA] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] |
Rep. Gary Palmer [R-AL] | Rep. John Fleming [R-LA] | Rep. Tim Huelskamp [R-KS] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] |
Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Kristi Noem [R-SD] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Mick Mulvaney [R-SC] |
Rep. Stephen Fincher [R-TN] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Todd Rokita [R-IN] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] |
Roll Calls
House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 207 N: 143 NV: 84 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2015-01-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2015-01-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB56 (Related) 2015-01-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB1621 (Related) 2015-06-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB5525 (Related) 2016-06-21 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 207 - 143 (Roll no. 334).
SB1621 (Related) 2015-06-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB5525 (Related) 2016-06-21 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 207 - 143 (Roll no. 334).
Subjects
Science, technology, communications
Telecommunication rates and fees
Telephone and wireless communication
Telecommunication rates and fees
Telephone and wireless communication
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/266/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr266/BILLS-114hr266ih.pdf |
Roll Call | https://clerk.house.gov/Votes/2016334 |