US HB5481 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-19 - Became Public Law No: 117-233.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-19 - Became Public Law No: 117-233.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To name the Department of Veterans Affairs community-based outpatient clinic in Forest City, North Carolina, as the "Corporal Jerry K. Crump VA Clinic".
Title
To name the Department of Veterans Affairs community-based outpatient clinic in Forest City, North Carolina, as the "Master Sergeant Jerry K. Crump VA Clinic".
Sponsors
Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] | Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Patrick McHenry [R-NC] |
Rep. David Cawthorn [R-NC] | Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] | Rep. Dan Bishop [R-NC] | Rep. Greg Murphy [R-NC] |
Rep. Deborah Ross [D-NC] | Rep. David Price [D-NC] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Kathy Manning [D-NC] |
Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] | Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-19 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-233. |
2022-12-19 | House | Signed by President. |
2022-12-16 | House | Presented to President. |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-12-06 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7008) |
2022-12-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-11-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2022-11-14 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2022-11-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-11-14 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8446) |
2022-11-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5481. |
2022-11-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8446-8447) |
2022-11-14 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2021-10-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-10-05 | House | Introduced in House |