US HB5349 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on December 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 117-278.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on December 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 117-278.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1550 State Road S-38-211 in Orangeburg, South Carolina, as the "J.I. Washington Post Office Building".
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1550 State Road S-38-211 in Orangeburg, South Carolina, as the "J.I. Washington Post Office Building".
Sponsors
Rep. James Clyburn [D-SC] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Nancy Mace [R-SC] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] |
Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC] | Rep. William Timmons [R-SC] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-27 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-278. |
2022-12-27 | House | Signed by President. |
2022-12-23 | House | Presented to President. |
2022-12-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7282-7283) |
2022-12-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2022-12-14 | House | Pursuant to section 5 of H. Res. 1518, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 1082, as amended; H.R. 5349; H.R. 6218; H.R. 6220; H.R. 6221; H.R. 6611, as amended; H.R. 6630; H.R. 6725; H.R. 7077, agreed to Senate amendment; H.R. 7832; H.R. 8665; S. 558; and S. 789. S. 558; and S. 789. (consideration: CR H9803-9810; text: CR H9804) |
2022-12-14 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1518, proceedings on H.R. 5349 are considered vacated. |
2022-12-12 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-12-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5349. |
2022-12-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9661-9662; text: CR H9661) |
2022-12-12 | House | Ms. Norton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-04-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-04-06 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-09-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2021-09-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR1518 (Related) 2022-12-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.