US HB5332 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Protecting Your Credit Score Act of 2020 This bill revises provisions related to consumer credit reports and credit reporting agencies. (Sec. 2) Credit reporting agencies are directed to create a central online portal that allows consumers to (1) access free credit reports and credit scores, (2) dispute errors, and (3) place or lift security freezes. (Sec. 3) Credit reporting agencies must verify specified identifying information when adding credit information to a consumer's file. Credit reporting agencies must also perform periodic audits of credit reports to ensure accuracy. (Sec. 4) A credit reporting ombudsperson, whose responsibilities include resolving persistent errors by credit reporting agencies, is established at the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau (CFPB). Credit reporting agencies must provide a consumer with additional information after an agency's reinvestigation of disputed credit information. (Sec. 5) A court may award injunctive relief to compel a credit reporting agency to comply with credit report protections. (Sec. 6) Consumers will receive a free credit score upon request and upon certain adverse credit decisions. Credit reporting agencies must provide available information to consumers regarding the purpose behind the procurement of a credit report. (Sec. 7) The bill establishes a public registry for credit reporting agencies. (Sec. 8) The bill also provides the CFPB with statutory authority for supervising credit reporting agencies. (Sec. 9) The bill gives the CFPB the authority to establish data security requirements for credit reporting agencies. (Sec. 10) The CFPB must report on the effectiveness of specified audits in addressing data security risks at credit reporting agencies. (Sec. 11) The Government Accountability Office must report on the feasibility of credit reporting agencies replacing Social Security numbers as identifiers with another type of federal identification.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting Your Credit Score Act of 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-29 - House - On passage RC# 126 (Y: 234 N: 179 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - House - On motion to recommit with instructions RC# 125 (Y: 184 N: 228 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30SenateReceived in the Senate.
2020-06-29HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-06-29HouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 234 - 179 (Roll no. 126). (text: 06/26/2020 CR H2559-2561)
2020-06-29HouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 184 - 228 (Roll no. 125).
2020-06-29HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2665-2667)
2020-06-29HousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the motion to recommit with instructions, the Chair put the question on the motion and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Riggleman demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further consideration on the motion to recommit until a time to be announced.
2020-06-29HouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
2020-06-29HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Riggleman motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to strike section 3 from the bill and insert a new section prohibiting the use of social security numbers.
2020-06-29HouseMr. Riggleman moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Financial Services. (text: CR H2663)
2020-06-29HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2663-2664)
2020-06-26HousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 1(c) of Rule XIX, further proceedings on H.R. 5332 were postponed.
2020-06-26HouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
2020-06-26HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 5332.
2020-06-26HouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 1425, H.R. 5332, H.R. 7120, H.R. 7301 and H.J. Res. 90. The resolution provides that the provisions of section 125(c) of the Uruguay Round Agreements Act shall not apply during the remainder of the 116th Congress and the resolution amends H.Res. 967, agreed to on May 15, 2020.
2020-06-26HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1017. (consideration: CR H2559-2571)
2020-06-24HouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1017 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1425, H.R. 5332, H.R. 7120, H.R. 7301 and H.J. Res. 90. The resolution provides that the provisions of section 125(c) of the Uruguay Round Agreements Act shall not apply during the remainder of the 116th Congress and the resolution amends H.Res. 967, agreed to on May 15, 2020.
2020-03-12HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 335.
2020-03-12HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 116-416.
2019-12-11HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 31 - 24.
2019-12-11HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-12-10HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-12-06HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
2019-12-06HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR1017 (Related) 2020-06-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback