US HB5297 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Credits for Kids Act of 2016 This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to require taxpayers who are claiming the refundable portion of the child tax credit to include their Social Security number on their tax return. The bill includes an exception if the return includes a certification from the state in which the taxpayer resides that one or more qualifying children resided in the taxpayer's household for at least six months during the year.
Title
Credits for Kids Act of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Mick Mulvaney [R-SC] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Mark Sanford [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2016-05-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4722 (Related) 2016-03-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 362.
HB192 (Related) 2015-01-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2334 (Related) 2015-05-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2956 (Related) 2015-07-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4140 (Related) 2015-12-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
HB192 (Related) 2015-01-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2334 (Related) 2015-05-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2956 (Related) 2015-07-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4140 (Related) 2015-12-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/5297/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr5297/BILLS-114hr5297ih.pdf |