US HB4722 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 362.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 362.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Refundable Child Tax Credit Eligibility Verification Reform Act of 2016 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to require taxpayers who are claiming the refundable portion of the child tax credit to include their social security account number on their tax return.
Title
Refundable Child Tax Credit Eligibility Verification Reform Act of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Johnson [R-TX] | Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] | Rep. James Renacci [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 362. |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-476. |
2016-03-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 15. |
2016-03-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2016-03-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2334 (Same As) 2015-05-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2956 (Related) 2015-07-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4140 (Related) 2015-12-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
HB5297 (Related) 2016-05-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB192 (Related) 2015-01-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2956 (Related) 2015-07-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4140 (Related) 2015-12-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
HB5297 (Related) 2016-05-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB192 (Related) 2015-01-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.