US HB5294 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-11 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 32 - 26.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-11 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 32 - 26.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Places requirements on lenders, servicers, or assignees of postsecondary education loans, establishes standards for reporting student loan information to consumer reporting agencies, and requires certification of certain educational lenders. Specifically, the bill establishes rules for lenders, servicers, or assignees of postsecondary education loans, including requirements related to (1) the sale, transfer, or assignment of such loans; (2) interest rate and term changes for such loans; (3) payment information required to be included with each billing cycle; and (4) application and allocation of payments. The Consumer Financial Protection Bureau (CFPB) must develop and issue model forms to allow borrowers to compare alternative repayment options, forbearance, and deferment options. The CFPB must also establish a student loan servicing interagency working group, which shall make recommendations for the regulations required under the bill. Further, the CFPB must issue rules to establish standards for the furnishing of information related to student loans to a consumer reporting agency, and any furnisher of such information must comply with such rules. A private educational lender must, in general, obtain a private loan certification from an institution of higher education before consummating any loan with a student attending such institution.
Title
Student Borrower Protections Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 32 - 26. |
2019-12-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-12-10 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-12-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-12-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-12-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1354 (Related) 2019-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advisory bodies
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Consumer credit
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Credit and credit markets
Education
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Higher education
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Licensing and registrations
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Advisory bodies
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Consumer credit
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Credit and credit markets
Education
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Higher education
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Licensing and registrations
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5294/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5294/BILLS-116hr5294ih.pdf |