US HB5287 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
East Coast and Gulf Coast Ocean Protection Act of 2010 - Amends the Outer Continental Shelf Lands Act to prohibit the Secretary of the Interior from issuing a lease for the exploration, development, or production of oil or natural gas in any area on the outer Continental Shelf of the Atlantic Ocean or the Gulf of Mexico.
Title
East Coast and Gulf Coast Ocean Protection Act of 2010
Sponsors
Rep. Corrine Brown [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. | |
2010-05-12 | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5213 (Related) 2010-05-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
SB3358 (Related) 2010-05-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB3358 (Related) 2010-05-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/5287/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr5287/BILLS-111hr5287ih.pdf |