US HB5242 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
School Resource Officer Assessment Act of 2018 (Sec. 2) This bill requires the Department of Justice and the Department of Education to conduct and submit to Congress a survey of the assignment of school resource officers at public elementary and secondary schools.
Title
School Resource Officer Assessment Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] | Rep. Stephen Knight [R-CA] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] |
Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] |
Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD] | Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2018-05-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-05-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3948) |
2018-05-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5242. |
2018-05-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3947-3949) |
2018-05-15 | House | Mr. Rokita moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-04-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2018-03-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-03-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-03-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Education
Educational facilities and institutions
Elementary and secondary education
Government studies and investigations
Law enforcement officers
School administration
Congressional oversight
Education
Educational facilities and institutions
Elementary and secondary education
Government studies and investigations
Law enforcement officers
School administration