US HB5215 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans Affairs Purchase Card Misuse Mitigation Act (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to prohibit employees who have knowingly misused VA purchase cards from serving as purchase card holders or approving officials. Such prohibition shall be in addition to any other applicable penalty.
Title
Veterans Affairs Purchase Card Misuse Mitigation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] |
Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2018-05-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-05-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4256) |
2018-05-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5215. |
2018-05-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4256-4257) |
2018-05-21 | House | Mr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 535. |
2018-05-21 | House | Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-692. |
2018-05-08 | House | Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations Discharged. |
2018-05-08 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2018-05-08 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2018-03-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Public contracts and procurement
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Public contracts and procurement