US HB5174 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 613.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 613.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Energy Emergency Leadership Act This bill amends the Department of Energy Organization Act to require the Secretary of the Department of Energy to assign energy emergency and energy security functions to an Assistant Secretary, including responsibilities with respect to infrastructure and cybersecurity.
Title
Energy Emergency Leadership Act
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-28 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 613. |
2018-06-28 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-793. |
2018-05-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2018-05-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-04-18 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2018-04-18 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-03-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2018-03-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2018-03-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Computer security and identity theft
Department of Energy
Emergency planning and evacuation
Energy
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Federal-Indian relations
Infrastructure development
Intergovernmental relations
State and local government operations
Department of Energy
Emergency planning and evacuation
Energy
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Federal-Indian relations
Infrastructure development
Intergovernmental relations
State and local government operations