US HB5094 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
STAND for Ukraine Act Stability and Democracy for Ukraine Act This bill provides that no federal agency should take any action or extend any assistance that recognizes Russian sovereignty over Crimea, its airspace, or its territorial waters. The bill urges that the Government Publishing Office not print any document indicating Crimea as part of the Russian Federation (Russia). U.S. sanctions provided for in Executive Orders 13660, 13661, 13662, (blocking property of persons contributing to the situation in Ukraine) and 13685 (blocking property of persons contributing to the situation in Crimea) shall remain in effect until the President certifies to Congress that: Ukraine's sovereignty over Crimea has been restored, or the status of Crimea has been resolved to the satisfaction of a democratically elected government of Ukraine. The Support for the Sovereignty, Integrity, Democracy, and Economic Stability of Ukraine Act of 2014 is amended to authorize the President to block and prohibit a foreign person's transactions of property or property interests that are U.S.-sited or controlled by a U.S. person if the foreign person has knowingly: (1) violated such executive orders, or (2) facilitated deceptive or structured transactions for or on behalf of any person subject to U.S. sanctions against Russia. The President shall: use U.S. influence to seek North Atlantic Treaty Organization (NATO) adoption of a policy that opposes the transfer of defense articles and services to Russia while Russia occupies the territory of Ukraine or of a NATO member, and direct appropriate U.S. agencies to monitor and identify transfers by NATO members of defense articles and services to Russia. A license application or other authorization for the transfer of any defense article or service to or on behalf of a NATO member so identified shall be subject to a presumption of denial. The Sergei Magnitsky Rule of Law Accountability Act of 2012 is amended to include in the list of persons responsible for gross violations of human rights persons committing such actions in any territory forcibly occupied or otherwise controlled by Russia. The Department of State shall seek to establish an international consortium to increase private investment in Ukraine that shall include the United States. It is the sense of Congress that the Broadcasting Board of Governors shall establish Crimean Tatar services (subordinate to the Ukrainian language services) and broadcast Crimean Tatar language content into Crimea.
Title
STAND for Ukraine Act Stability and Democracy for Ukraine Act
Sponsors
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Sander Levin [D-MI] | Rep. Michael Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Ralph Abraham [R-LA] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] |
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Mike Pompeo [R-KS] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] |
Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Reid Ribble [R-WI] |
Rep. Tim Murphy [R-PA] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] |
Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] | Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] |
Rep. Rodney Frelinghuysen [R-NJ] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Patrick Meehan [R-PA] | Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] |
Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] |
Rep. Ryan Costello [R-PA] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2016-09-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-09-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5782-5784) |
2016-09-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5094. |
2016-09-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5782-5787) |
2016-09-21 | House | Mr. Royce moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-07-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2016-07-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-05-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade. |
2016-04-28 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2016-04-28 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2016-04-28 | House | Referred to House Financial Services |
2016-04-28 | House | Referred to House Foreign Affairs |
2016-04-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2016-04-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Alliances
Congressional oversight
Europe
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international banking
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Foreign property
Geography
Government information and archives
Human rights
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
Licensing and registrations
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Russia
Sanctions
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Trade restrictions
U.S. and foreign investments
Ukraine
War and emergency powers
Congressional oversight
Europe
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international banking
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Foreign property
Geography
Government information and archives
Human rights
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
Licensing and registrations
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Russia
Sanctions
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Trade restrictions
U.S. and foreign investments
Ukraine
War and emergency powers