US HB5074 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 36 - 10.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 36 - 10.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the American Taxpayer Relief Act of 2012 to delay implementation of the inclusion of oral-only ESRD-related drugs in the Medicare ESRD prospective payment system.
Title
Kidney PATIENT Act of 2023 Kidney Patient Access to Technologically Innovative and Essential Nephrology Treatments Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Carol Miller [R-WV] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] |
Rep. Donald Davis [D-NC] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. John Joyce [R-PA] | Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA] |
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Blake Moore [R-UT] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX] |
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 36 - 10. |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-03-12 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 16 - 10. |
2024-03-12 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-03-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 41 - 1. |
2024-03-06 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-08-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-07-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-07-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/5074/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr5074/BILLS-118hr5074ih.pdf |