US HB5029 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on August 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-04 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-04 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to furnish Vet Center readjustment counseling and related mental health services to members of the families of members or veterans of the Armed Forces who died by suicide, and other purposes.
Title
Expanding the Families of Veterans Access to Mental Health Services Act
Sponsors
Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] | Rep. Tracey Mann [R-KS] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY] |
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Andrew Garbarino [R-NY] | Rep. Pat Ryan [D-NY] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] |
Rep. Kathy Manning [D-NC] | Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-04 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2021-11-04 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-11-04 | House | Subcommittee on Health Discharged. |
2021-10-14 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-09-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-08-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-08-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2817 (Related) 2021-09-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB6411 (Related) 2022-07-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB6411 (Related) 2022-07-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/5029/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr5029/BILLS-117hr5029ih.pdf |