US HB4932 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-25)
Status: Introduced on October 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands coverage of telehealth services under Medicare. Among other things, the bill allows the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CMS) to waive certain restrictions, such as geographic restrictions, for services provided in high-need health professional shortage areas; excludes mental health and emergency medical services, as well as services provided at rural health clinics, federally qualified health centers, and Indian Health Service facilities, from such geographic restrictions; and allows the CMS to generally waive coverage restrictions during national emergencies. Additionally, the Medicare Payment Advisory Commission must report on information relating to the access of Medicare beneficiaries to telehealth services at home. The Center for Medicare and Medicaid Innovation may also test alternative payment models relating to expanded telehealth services.
Title
CONNECT for Health Act of 2019 Creating Opportunities Now for Necessary and Effective Care Technologies for Health Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-10-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2741 (Same As) 2019-10-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5201 (Related) 2020-12-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 580.
SB4796 (Related) 2020-10-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8527 (Related) 2020-10-02 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Oversight and Reform, House Administration, Rules, the Budget, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB5201 (Related) 2020-12-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 580.
SB4796 (Related) 2020-10-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8527 (Related) 2020-10-02 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Oversight and Reform, House Administration, Rules, the Budget, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Congressional oversight
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicare
Mental health
Minority health
Rural conditions and development
Telephone and wireless communication
Congressional oversight
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicare
Mental health
Minority health
Rural conditions and development
Telephone and wireless communication
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4932/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4932/BILLS-116hr4932ih.pdf |