US HB4877 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-25 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Department of Defense Appropriations Act, 2018 Provides FY2018 appropriations to the Department of Defense (DOD) for military activities. Excludes military construction, military family housing, civil works projects of the Army Corps of Engineers, and nuclear warheads, which are all considered in other appropriations bills. Provides appropriations to DOD for: Military Personnel; Operation and Maintenance; Procurement; Research, Development, Test and Evaluation; and Revolving and Management Funds. Provides appropriations for Other Department of Defense Programs, including: the Defense Health Program, Chemical Agents and Munitions Destruction, Drug-Interdiction and Counter-Drug Activities, and the Office of the Inspector General. Provides appropriations for Related Agencies, including the Central Intelligence Agency Retirement and Disability System Fund and the Intelligence Community Management Account. Provides appropriations for Overseas Contingency Operations/ Global War on Terrorism. Rescinds specified unobligated balances from prior appropriations to DOD. Sets forth permissible and prohibited uses for funds provided by this and other appropriations Acts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Defense Appropriations Act, 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-01-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-01-25HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB3219 (Related) 2017-08-01 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 187.
HB3354 (Related) 2017-09-27 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 230.
SB1519 (Related) 2018-03-22 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S1886-1892, S1892-1931)
HB695 (Same As) 2018-02-08 - Cloture on the motion to concur in the House amendment to the Senate amendment to H.R. 695 not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 55 - 44. Record Vote Number: 29. (CR S798)
HJR128 (Related) 2018-02-05 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB1892 (Related) 2018-02-09 - Became Public Law No: 115-123. (TXT | PDF)
HB1625 (Related) 2018-03-23 - Became Public Law No: 115-141.

Subjects

Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Afghanistan
Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
Appropriations
Armed forces and national security
Arms control and nonproliferation
Asia
Assault and harassment offenses
Atmospheric science and weather
Aviation and airports
Buy American requirements
Caribbean area
Central Intelligence Agency (CIA)
Chemical and biological weapons
Computers and information technology
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Crimes against women
Cuba
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Detention of persons
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Education programs funding
Educational facilities and institutions
Educational technology and distance education
Elementary and secondary education
Europe
Executive agency funding and structure
Foreign aid and international relief
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government liability
Government studies and investigations
Guam
Health facilities and institutions
Higher education
Idaho
Illinois
Indian lands and resources rights
Indian social and development programs
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International law and treaties
International monetary system and foreign exchange
Iran
Iraq
Israel
Jordan
Kuwait
Latin America
Manufacturing
Marshall Islands
Medical education
Metals
Micronesia
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military command and structure
Military education and training
Military facilities and property
Military medicine
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Military readiness
Minnesota
Montana
National Guard and reserves
National Security Agency
National symbols
Nevada
New Jersey
North Dakota
North Korea
Northern Mariana Islands
Nuclear weapons
Oil and gas
Oregon
Pacific Ocean
Pakistan
Palau
Pornography
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public contracts and procurement
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Russia
Sex offenses
Small business
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
South Dakota
Syria
Technology transfer and commercialization
Terrorism
Trade agreements and negotiations
Trade restrictions
Transportation costs
U.S. territories and protectorates
Ukraine
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' medical care
War and emergency powers
Washington State

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback