US SB1519 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S1886-1892, S1892-1931)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2018 This bill authorizes FY2018 appropriations and sets forth policies regarding the military activities of the Department of Defense (DOD), military construction, and the defense activities of the Department of Energy (DOE). The bill authorizes appropriations, but does not provide budget authority for discretionary programs, which is included in subsequent appropriations legislation. The bill authorizes appropriations to DOD for Procurement; Research, Development, Test, and Evaluation; Operation and Maintenance; the Revolving and Working Capital Funds; the Joint Urgent Operational Needs Fund; Chemical Agents and Munitions Destruction; Defense-Wide Drug Interdiction and Counter-Drug Activities; the Defense Inspector General; the Defense Health Program; and Overseas Contingency Operations. The bill also authorizes the FY2018 personnel strengths for active duty and reserve forces and sets forth policies regarding military personnel, compensation and other personnel benefits, health care, acquisition policy and management, DOD organization and management, civilian personnel matters, navy vessels and shipyards, DOE national security programs, and matters relating to foreign nations. Military Construction Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2018 The bill authorizes appropriations and sets forth policies regarding military construction for the Army, Navy, Air Force, defense agencies, the North Atlantic Treaty Organization Security Investment Program, and Guard and Reserve Forces facilities. The bill also authorizes appropriations for base realignment and closure activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22SenateMotion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S1886-1892, S1892-1931)
2018-01-18SenateMotion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S270)
2017-12-19SenateMotion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S8073)
2017-11-29SenateMotion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S7367-7393)
2017-11-28SenateMotion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S7351-7355)
2017-09-27SenateMotion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S6159-6175)
2017-09-26SenateMotion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S6097-6121; S6122-6127)
2017-09-25SenateMotion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S5881)
2017-07-10SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 165.
2017-07-10SenateCommittee on Armed Services. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator McCain. With written report No. 115-125. Additional views filed.

Same As/Similar To

HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
SB1408 (Related) 2017-06-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HR431 (Similar To) 2017-07-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR440 (Similar To) 2017-07-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2052 (Related) 2017-05-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB1296 (Related) 2017-06-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB1378 (Related) 2017-06-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB1387 (Related) 2017-06-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB1433 (Related) 2017-06-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB1440 (Related) 2017-06-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB1443 (Related) 2017-06-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB1468 (Related) 2017-06-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB1470 (Related) 2017-06-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB1471 (Related) 2017-06-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB1478 (Related) 2017-06-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3860-3861)
HR616 (Related) 2017-11-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB4877 (Related) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Subjects

Administrative remedies
Afghanistan
Alliances
Armed forces and national security
Armed Forces Retirement Home
Asia
Assault and harassment offenses
Aviation and airports
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Burma
California
Caribbean area
Chemical and biological weapons
China
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Cuba
Defense Nuclear Facilities Safety Board
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Department of Energy
Department of Homeland Security
Department of Transportation
Department of Veterans Affairs
Detention of persons
Economic development
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy efficiency and conservation
Europe
Executive agency funding and structure
Foreign aid and international relief
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Guam
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health care costs and insurance
Health facilities and institutions
Health promotion and preventive care
Illinois
Immigration status and procedures
Intellectual property
International law and treaties
Iran
Iraq
Israel
Judges
Latin America
Lawyers and legal services
Licensing and registrations
Marine and inland water transportation
Massachusetts
Medical research
Mental health
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military command and structure
Military education and training
Military facilities and property
Military law
Military medicine
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Military readiness
National Guard and reserves
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Nuclear weapons
Pacific Ocean
Pakistan
Palau
Photography and imaging
Public contracts and procurement
Research and development
Right of privacy
Rural conditions and development
Russia
Sex offenses
Small business
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Syria
Terrorism
Texas
Transportation safety and security
Ukraine
Unemployment
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' medical care
Visas and passports
Water quality
Water use and supply
Wyoming

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback