US HJR128 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-05 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Department of Defense Appropriations Act, 2018 DIVISION B--FURTHER EXTENSION OF CONTINUING APPROPRIATIONS ACT, 2018 Further Extension of Continuing Appropriations Act, 2018 This division amends the Continuing Appropriations Act, 2018 to provide continuing FY2018 appropriations to most federal agencies through March 23, 2018 (February 8, 2018, under current law). It prevents a partial government shutdown that would otherwise occur when the existing continuing resolution expires because the FY2018 appropriations bills have not been enacted. The division also: (1) authorizes the Department of Energy to drawdown and sell specified crude oil from the Strategic Petroleum Reserve in FY2018; and (2) makes additional funding available for the 2020 Decennial Census Program, the Southeastern Power Administration, and juror fees. The division provides emergency funding for the Small Business Administration Disaster Loans Program Account. (Emergency spending is exempt from discretionary spending limits and other budget enforcement rules.) DIVISION C--DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE APPROPRIATIONS ACT, 2018 This division provides appropriations to the Department of Defense for the remainder of FY2018. DIVISION D--MISCELLANEOUS This division amends the Food Security Act of 1985 to extend the Department of Agriculture Environmental Quality Incentives Program (EQIP) through FY2019. (EQIP provides financial and technical assistance for agricultural producers and land owners to implement certain conservation practices.) DIVISION E--BUDGETARY EFFECTS This division exempts the budgetary effects of division D from Pay-As-You-Go (PAYGO) rules and certain budget scorekeeping guidelines.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Defense Appropriations Act, 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-05HouseReferred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-02-05HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB695 (Related) 2018-02-08 - Cloture on the motion to concur in the House amendment to the Senate amendment to H.R. 695 not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 55 - 44. Record Vote Number: 29. (CR S798)
HB3219 (Related) 2017-08-01 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 187.
HB4877 (Related) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HJR124 (Related) 2017-12-13 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB1892 (Related) 2018-02-09 - Became Public Law No: 115-123.

Subjects

Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Afghanistan
Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
Appropriations
Armed forces and national security
Arms control and nonproliferation
Asia
Assault and harassment offenses
Atmospheric science and weather
Aviation and airports
Buy American requirements
Caribbean area
Census and government statistics
Central Intelligence Agency (CIA)
Chemical and biological weapons
Computers and information technology
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Crimes against women
Cuba
Defense spending
Department of Commerce
Department of Defense
Detention of persons
Disaster relief and insurance
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Education programs funding
Educational facilities and institutions
Educational technology and distance education
Electric power generation and transmission
Elementary and secondary education
Europe
Executive agency funding and structure
Foreign aid and international relief
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government liability
Government studies and investigations
Guam
Health facilities and institutions
Higher education
Idaho
Illinois
Indian lands and resources rights
Indian social and development programs
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International law and treaties
International monetary system and foreign exchange
Iran
Iraq
Israel
Jordan
Judicial procedure and administration
Kuwait
Latin America
Legal fees and court costs
Manufacturing
Marshall Islands
Medical education
Metals
Micronesia
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military command and structure
Military education and training
Military facilities and property
Military medicine
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Military readiness
Minnesota
Montana
National Guard and reserves
National Security Agency
National symbols
Nevada
New Jersey
North Dakota
North Korea
Northern Mariana Islands
Nuclear weapons
Oil and gas
Oregon
Pacific Ocean
Pakistan
Palau
Pornography
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public contracts and procurement
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Russia
Sex offenses
Small business
Small Business Administration
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
South Dakota
Strategic materials and reserves
Syria
Technology transfer and commercialization
Terrorism
Trade agreements and negotiations
Trade restrictions
Transportation costs
U.S. territories and protectorates
Ukraine
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' medical care
War and emergency powers
Washington State

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback