US HB4836 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on July 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend chapter 44 of title 18, United States Code, to require the safe storage of firearms, and for other purposes.
Title
Firearm Owners Responsibility and Safety Act
Sponsors
Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Mondaire Jones [D-NY] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] |
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2021-07-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-07-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2814 (Related) 2022-07-26 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 340.
SB1338 (Related) 2021-04-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1338 (Related) 2021-04-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/4836/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr4836/BILLS-117hr4836ih.pdf |