US HB2814 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 86-0)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-26 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 340.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-26 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 340.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To repeal the Protection of Lawful Commerce in Arms Act, and provide for the discoverability and admissibility of gun trace information in civil proceedings.
Title
Equal Access to Justice for Victims of Gun Violence Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-26 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 340. |
2022-07-26 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 117-436. |
2022-07-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 18. |
2022-07-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-07-20 | House | Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Discharged. |
2021-10-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2021-04-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-04-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1338 (Same As) 2021-04-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB4836 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB4836 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.