US HB4796 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

USA Act of 2018 Uniting and Securing America Act of 2018 This bill provides conditional permanent resident status for an alien meeting specified requirements, including having entered the United States when younger than 18 years old and residing in the United States since December 31, 2013. An individual may apply to have such conditional basis removed after meeting specified eligibility requirements. The Department of Homeland Security (DHS) shall cancel the removal of, and adjust to the status of an alien lawfully admitted for permanent residence on a conditional basis, an individual who was granted Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals (DACA) status, unless such individual has engaged in disqualifying conduct. The bill repeals provisions that deny an unlawful alien eligibility for higher education benefits on the basis of residence within a state unless a U.S. citizen or national is eligible for such benefits without regard to whether such citizen or national is such a resident. DHS shall: (1) deploy the most practical and effective technology available in order to achieve situational awareness and operational control along the U.S. border; (2) submit to Congress a comprehensive southern border strategy to achieve border control; and (3) begin eradicating the carrizo cane plant and salt cedar along the Rio Grande River. DHS may construct new ports of entry along the northern and southern borders. The bill establishes Operation Stonegarden in DHS to provide border security grants to law enforcement agencies in border or maritime border states that are involved in U.S. Customs and Border Protection operations DHS shall establish a two-year grant program to improve emergency communications in the southern border region for individuals who are at risk of violence and lack cellular and LTE network service. The number of immigration judges is increased. The President shall designate a senior official to coordinate federal and international efforts to strengthen citizen security, the rule of law, and economic prosperity in Central America.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

USA Act of 2018 Uniting and Securing America Act of 2018

Sponsors

Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX]Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI]Sen. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R-FL]
Rep. Charles Dent [R-PA]Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV]Rep. Joe Barton [R-TX]Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]
Rep. David Valadao [R-CA]Rep. John Faso [R-NY]Rep. Jeff Denham [R-CA]Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ]
Rep. John Katko [R-NY]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Mia Love [R-UT]Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN]
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR]Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA]Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]Rep. Bill Shuster [R-PA]
Rep. Ryan Costello [R-PA]Rep. Peter King [R-NY]Rep. Stephen Knight [R-CA]Rep. David Reichert [R-WA]
Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX]Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. Michelle Lujan Grisham [D-NM]Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]
Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Sen. Krysten Sinema [D-AZ]Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV]
Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA]Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX]Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]
Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO]Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA]
Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]
Rep. Mac Thornberry [R-TX]Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL]Rep. David Trott [R-MI]Rep. John Delaney [D-MD]
Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-26HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
2018-01-24HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
2018-01-16HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Education and the Workforce, Energy and Commerce, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-01-16HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Education and the Workforce, Energy and Commerce, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-01-16HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Education and the Workforce, Energy and Commerce, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-01-16HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Education and the Workforce, Energy and Commerce, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-01-16HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Education and the Workforce, Energy and Commerce, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-01-16HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB3440 (Related) 2017-09-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
SB1615 (Related) 2017-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB3479 (Related) 2017-08-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
SB2367 (Related) 2018-02-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects

Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Aquatic ecology
Arizona
Assault and harassment offenses
Border security and unlawful immigration
California
Canada
Child safety and welfare
Citizenship and naturalization
Colombia
Congressional oversight
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Customs enforcement
Department of Homeland Security
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Domestic violence and child abuse
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
El Salvador
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency communications systems
Federal officials
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign labor
Forests, forestry, trees
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Guatemala
Higher education
Honduras
Human rights
Human trafficking
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International organizations and cooperation
Judges
Judicial procedure and administration
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Lakes and rivers
Latin America
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mexico
Military personnel and dependents
Multilateral development programs
New Mexico
Organized crime
Pest management
Preschool education
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Rule of law and government transparency
Sex offenses
Smuggling and trafficking
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
State and local government operations
Student aid and college costs
Telephone and wireless communication
Texas
User charges and fees
Violent crime
Visas and passports
Vocational and technical education

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback