US SB1615 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Introduced on July 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Dream Act of 2017 This bill directs the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to cancel removal and grant lawful permanent resident status on a conditional basis to an alien who is inadmissible or deportable or is in temporary protected status who: (1) has been continuously physically present in the United States for four years preceding this bill's enactment; (2) was younger than 18 years of age on the initial date of U.S. entry; (3) is not inadmissible on criminal, security, terrorism, or other grounds; (4) has not participated in persecution; (5) has not been convicted of specified federal or state offenses; and (6) has fulfilled specified educational requirements. DHS shall cancel the removal of, and adjust to the status of an alien lawfully admitted for permanent residence on a conditional basis, an alien who was granted Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals (DACA) status unless the alien has engaged in conduct that would make the alien ineligible for DACA. DHS may not: (1) grant conditional permanent resident status without the submission of biometric and background data, and completion of background and medical checks; and (2) disclose or use information provided in applications filed under this bill or in DACA requests for immigration enforcement purposes. The bill prescribes the conditions under which DHS: (1) may terminate a person's conditional permanent resident status, and (2) shall adjust a person's conditional status to permanent resident status. The bill: (1) sets forth documentation requirements for establishing DACA eligibility, and (2) repeals the denial of an unlawful alien's eligibility for higher education benefits based on state residence.
Title
Dream Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Jeff Flake [R-AZ] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] |
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] |
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-20 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3440 (Same As) 2017-09-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
HB4796 (Related) 2018-01-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
SB2367 (Related) 2018-02-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB4796 (Related) 2018-01-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
SB2367 (Related) 2018-02-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Citizenship and naturalization
Department of Homeland Security
Elementary and secondary education
Foreign labor
Government information and archives
Higher education
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Military personnel and dependents
Preschool education
State and local government operations
Student aid and college costs
User charges and fees
Visas and passports
Administrative remedies
Citizenship and naturalization
Department of Homeland Security
Elementary and secondary education
Foreign labor
Government information and archives
Higher education
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Military personnel and dependents
Preschool education
State and local government operations
Student aid and college costs
User charges and fees
Visas and passports
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/1615/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s1615/BILLS-115s1615is.pdf |