US HB3479 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Introduced on July 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Secure Miles with All Resources and Technology Act This bill amends the Illegal Immigration Reform and Immigrant Responsibility Act of 1996 to direct the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to deploy the most practical and effective technology available (such as radar, tunnel detection technology, unmanned aerial vehicles, and sensors) to achieve situational awareness and operational control along the U.S. border. DHS shall submit to Congress a comprehensive southern border strategy, which shall include: (1) a list of known physical barriers, technologies, tools, and other devices to achieve situational awareness and operational control of the border and their related cost estimates; and (2) information from federal, state, local, and private sources. DHS shall begin eradicating the carrizo cane plant and salt cedar along the Rio Grande River. The Homeland Security Act of 2002 is amended to establish Operation Stonegarden in DHS to provide border security grants to law enforcement agencies: (1) in a state bordering Canada or Mexico or a maritime border state or territory, and (2) involved in an ongoing U.S. Customs and Border Protection operation coordinated through a sector office. DHS shall establish a two-year grant program to improve emergency communications in the southern border region for individuals who: (1) reside or work in a southern border state, and (2) are at greater risk of violence due to border proximity and a lack of residential or business cellular and LTE network service. Such grants may be used to purchase satellite telephone communications systems and services that provide access to 9-1-1 service and that are equipped with Global Positioning System receivers.
Title
Secure Miles with All Resources and Technology Act
Sponsors
Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. David Valadao [R-CA] | Rep. Stephen Knight [R-CA] |
Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Keith Rothfus [R-PA] | Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] |
Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. David Young [R-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security. |
2017-07-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2017-07-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4796 (Related) 2018-01-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
Subjects
Aquatic ecology
Arizona
Border security and unlawful immigration
California
Canada
Congressional oversight
Customs enforcement
Emergency communications systems
Forests, forestry, trees
Immigration
Lakes and rivers
Latin America
Mexico
New Mexico
Pest management
Telephone and wireless communication
Texas
Violent crime
Arizona
Border security and unlawful immigration
California
Canada
Congressional oversight
Customs enforcement
Emergency communications systems
Forests, forestry, trees
Immigration
Lakes and rivers
Latin America
Mexico
New Mexico
Pest management
Telephone and wireless communication
Texas
Violent crime
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3479/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3479/BILLS-115hr3479ih.pdf |