US HB4785 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-05 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-05 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To support the human rights of Uyghurs and members of other minority groups residing in the Xinjiang Uyghur Autonomous Region and safeguard their distinct identity, and for other purposes.
Title
Uyghur Policy Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-01 - House - Final Passage Under Suspension of the Rules Results (Y: 407 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2022-12-01 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2022-12-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-12-01 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 17 (Roll no. 494). (text: 11/29/2022 CR H8633-8634) |
2022-12-01 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8695-8696) |
2022-11-29 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-11-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4785. |
2022-11-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8633-8637) |
2022-11-29 | House | Ms. Jacobs (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2021-09-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2021-09-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-08-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific, Central Asia and Nonproliferation. |
2021-07-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2021-07-29 | House | Introduced in House |