US HB4748 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on July 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-05 - Subcommittee Hearings Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To provide for the recognition of certain Alaska Native communities and the settlement of certain claims under the Alaska Native Claims Settlement Act, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unrecognized Southeast Alaska Native Communities Recognition and Compensation Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-12-05HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held
2023-11-28HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Indian and Insular Affairs.
2023-07-19HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2023-07-19HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1889 (Related) 2023-12-14 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback