US HB473 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 637.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 637.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require a review of Department of Homeland Security trusted traveler programs, and for other purposes.
Title
Trusted Traveler Reconsideration and Restoration Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 637. |
2022-12-13 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. With written report No. 117-253. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2021-04-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-04-19 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1898-1899) |
2021-04-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 473. |
2021-04-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1898-1899) |
2021-04-19 | House | Mr. Torres (NY) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-01-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security. |
2021-01-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1605 (Related) 2021-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 117-81.
HB4350 (Related) 2022-03-01 - Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 144.
HB4350 (Related) 2022-03-01 - Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 144.