US HB468 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-10 - Became Public Law No: 117-186.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-10 - Became Public Law No: 117-186.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 49, United States Code, to permit the use of incentive payments to expedite certain federally financed airport development projects.
Title
Expedited Delivery of Airport Infrastructure Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO] | Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-10 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-186. |
2022-10-10 | House | Signed by President. |
2022-10-04 | House | Presented to President. |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-09-27 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5112) |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2021-06-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-06-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2768) |
2021-06-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 468. |
2021-06-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2768-2769) |
2021-06-15 | House | Ms. Norton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-05-28 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 23. |
2021-05-28 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 117-40. |
2021-03-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2021-03-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-03-24 | House | Subcommittee on Aviation Discharged. |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2021-01-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2053 (Related) 2021-06-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.