US HB4626 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to require an independent assessment of health care delivery systems and management processes of the Department of Veterans Affairs be conducted once every 10 years, and for other purposes.
Title
VA Assessment by Independent Measures Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-11-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-11-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6281-6282) |
2021-11-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4626. |
2021-11-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6281-6283) |
2021-11-16 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2021-07-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2021-07-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-07-28 | House | Subcommittee on Health Discharged. |
2021-07-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-07-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-07-22 | House | Introduced in House |