US HB4575 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-14 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-14 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the VA MISSION Act of 2018, to expand the peer specialist support program of the Department of Veterans Affairs to all medical centers of the Department, and for other purposes.
Title
Veteran Peer Specialist Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX] | Rep. Tracey Mann [R-KS] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] |
Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Young Kim [R-CA] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] |
Rep. Andrew Garbarino [R-NY] | Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA] | Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ] | Rep. Kathy Manning [D-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-14 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-09-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-07-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-07-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2386 (Same As) 2021-10-20 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/4575/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr4575/BILLS-117hr4575ih.pdf |