US HB4532 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands eligibility for grants that provide per diem funding to state nursing homes for veterans to include veterans homes established by Native American tribes.
Title
Nursing Home Care for Native American Veterans Act
Sponsors
Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-09-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-09-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2558 (Same As) 2020-09-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 541.
HB7105 (Related) 2021-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-315.
HB7105 (Related) 2021-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-315.
Subjects
Building construction
Congressional oversight
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Minority health
Native Americans
Veterans' medical care
Congressional oversight
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Minority health
Native Americans
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4532/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4532/BILLS-116hr4532ih.pdf |