US SB2558 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 541.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 541.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands eligibility for grants that provide per diem funding to state nursing homes for veterans to include veterans homes established by Native American tribes.
Title
Nursing Home Care for Native American Veterans Act
Sponsors
Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 541. |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Moran without amendment. Without written report. |
2020-08-05 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-09-26 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4532 (Same As) 2019-10-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB7105 (Related) 2021-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-315.
HB7105 (Related) 2021-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-315.
Subjects
Building construction
Congressional oversight
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Minority health
Native Americans
Veterans' medical care
Congressional oversight
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Minority health
Native Americans
Veterans' medical care