US HB4479 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 560.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 560.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to increase the annual cap on permits for alien workers entering the Northern Mariana Islands to work in the construction and extraction occupations. Specifically, DHS shall increase the cap by 3,000 permits each year for FY2020, FY2021, and FY2022. Various existing limitations on permits for such occupations shall not apply during these years.
Title
Disaster Recovery Workforce Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-18 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 560. |
2020-12-18 | House | Committee on the Judiciary discharged. |
2020-12-18 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-676, Part I. |
2019-12-05 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-12-05 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-09-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Disaster relief and insurance
Foreign labor
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
U.S. territories and protectorates
Foreign labor
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
U.S. territories and protectorates