US HB4459 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-27 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-27 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes (1) a mechanism to prevent communications equipment or services that pose a national security risk from entering U.S. networks, and (2) a program to remove any such equipment or services currently used in U.S. networks. Specifically, the bill prohibits the use of federal funds to obtain communications equipment or services from a company that poses a national security risk to U.S. communications networks (e.g., Huawei Technologies Co. Limited, Zhongxing Telecommunications Equipment Corporation, or any subsidiary or affiliate of either entity). The Federal Communications Commission must publish and maintain a list of such equipment or services. In addition, the bill establishes the Secure and Trusted Communications Networks Reimbursement Program to supply small communications providers (i.e., providers with 2 million or fewer customers) with funds to offset the cost of removing prohibited equipment or services from their networks and replacing it with more secure communications equipment or services.
Title
Secure and Trusted Communications Networks Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-27 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-09-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2019-09-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-09-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4998 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-124. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Asia
China
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Foreign and international corporations
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Homeland security
Licensing and registrations
Public contracts and procurement
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Asia
China
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Foreign and international corporations
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Homeland security
Licensing and registrations
Public contracts and procurement
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4459/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4459/BILLS-116hr4459ih.pdf |