US HB4407 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Counterterrorism Advisory Board Act of 2016 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to establish in the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) a board to coordinate and integrate DHS's intelligence, activities, and policy related to its counterterrorism mission and functions. The board shall: (1) advise the Secretary of DHS on the issuance of terrorism alerts, and (2) meet on a regular basis to discuss intelligence and coordinate ongoing threat mitigation efforts and departmental activities. The board's charter shall direct it to focus on the current threat environment and the importance of aligning departmental counterterrorism activities under the Secretary's guidance. The Secretary shall appoint a Coordinator for Counterterrorism within DHS who shall serve as the chair of the board and report on its status and activities.
Title
Counterterrorism Advisory Board Act of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] | Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA] |
Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX] | Rep. Loretta Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] |
Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-16 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 389 N: 5 NV: 39 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-05-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-05-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 389 - 5 (Roll no. 195). (text: CR H2413) |
2016-05-16 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2416) |
2016-05-16 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2016-05-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4407. |
2016-05-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2413-2415) |
2016-05-16 | House | Mr. Katko moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-04-11 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 366. |
2016-04-11 | House | Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-481. |
2016-02-02 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2016-02-02 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2016-02-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5471 (Related) 2016-06-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB3072 (Related) 2016-06-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB3072 (Related) 2016-06-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Terrorism
Emergency management
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Terrorism