US HB4380 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-21 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-21 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the El Paso Community Healing Garden National Memorial, and for other purposes.
Title
To designate the El Paso Community Healing Garden National Memorial, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX] |
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Al Green [D-TX] |
Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA] |
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX] | Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA] | Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] |
Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] |
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] | Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] |
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 403 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-21 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2022-03-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-03-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 403 - 25 (Roll no. 76). (text: 3/15/2022 CR H3728) |
2022-03-16 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3761-3762) |
2022-03-15 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-03-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4380. |
2022-03-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3729-3731) |
2022-03-15 | House | Mr. Grijalva moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 193. |
2022-03-09 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-264. |
2022-01-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-01-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-01-19 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2021-10-14 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-07-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2021-07-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-07-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4377 (Same As) 2022-09-21 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.