US HB4357 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on July 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability.
Pending: House Oversight, Management, and Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability.
Pending: House Oversight, Management, and Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to make certain reforms to the Department of Homeland Security, and for other purposes.
Title
DHS Reform Act of 2021 Department of Homeland Security Reform Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] |
Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Al Green [D-TX] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] |
Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] |
Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] | Rep. Ritchie Torres [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability. |
2021-07-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-07-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2021-07-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. |
2021-07-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6871 (Related) 2022-05-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB408 (Related) 2022-12-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 584.
HB408 (Related) 2022-12-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 584.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/4357/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr4357/BILLS-117hr4357ih.pdf |