US HB408 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 584.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 584.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to establish a mentor-protégé program, and for other purposes.
Title
Department of Homeland Security Mentor-Protégé Program Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 584. |
2022-12-05 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters with amendments. With written report No. 117-225. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2021-04-20 | House | Pursuant to section 6 of H. Res. 330, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 367; H.R. 370; H.R. 396; H.R. 397, as amended; H.R. 408; H.R. 490; H.R. 965, as amended; H.R. 1251, as amended; H.R. 1395; H.R. 1491; H.R. 1528; H.R. 1532; H.R. 1565; H.R. 1602; and H.R. 2523, as amended; and the following resolution was agreed to under suspension of the rules: H. Res. 124, as amended. (consideration: CR H1979-1994; text: CR H1982) |
2021-04-20 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 330, proceedings on H.R. 408 are considered vacated. |
2021-04-19 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-04-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 408. |
2021-04-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1902-1904; text: CR H1902-1903) |
2021-04-19 | House | Mr. Torres (NY) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability. |
2021-01-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR330 (Related) 2021-04-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB4350 (Related) 2022-03-01 - Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 144.
HB4357 (Related) 2021-07-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability.
HB7776 (Related) 2022-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 117-263.
HB4350 (Related) 2022-03-01 - Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 144.
HB4357 (Related) 2021-07-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability.
HB7776 (Related) 2022-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 117-263.