US HB4323 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on December 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 570.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 570.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting Veterans in STEM Careers Act (Sec. 3) This bill directs the National Science Foundation (NSF) to: (1) encourage veterans to pursue careers in STEM (science, technology, engineering, and mathematics) and computer science, and (2) submit a plan to Congress for enhancing veterans outreach. The plan shall: (1) report on NSF's outreach activities, (2) identify the best method for leveraging existing authorities and programs to support veterans in STEM careers and studies, and (3) include options for tracking veterans participation in NSF research and education programs. The National Science Board shall provide in its annual report on the state of science and engineering in the United States data on veterans in science and engineering careers or education programs. The bill provides for veterans participation and outreach in: (1) the Robert Noyce Teacher Scholarship program to recruit and train mathematics and science teachers, (2) NSF fellowships and masters fellowships for mathematics and science teachers, (3) computer and network security capacity building grants, and (4) traineeship grants leading to a doctorate degree in computer and network security research. The Office of Science and Technology Policy shall establish an interagency working group to coordinate federal programs and policies for transitioning and training veterans and military spouses for STEM careers. The interagency working group shall: (1) coordinate federal STEM outreach programs for veterans and military spouses; and (2) develop a strategic plan to prioritize objectives, specify progress metrics, and identify STEM career barriers.
Title
Supporting Veterans in STEM Careers Act
Sponsors
Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] | Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA] |
Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Stephen Knight [R-CA] | Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] | Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] |
Rep. Ralph Abraham [R-LA] | Rep. Beto O'Rourke [D-TX] | Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] |
Roll Calls
2017-12-19 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 693 (Y: 420 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 570. |
2018-09-12 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-12-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2017-12-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-12-19 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 420 - 1 (Roll no. 693). (text: CR 12/18/2017 H10163) |
2017-12-19 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10215) |
2017-12-18 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2017-12-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4323. |
2017-12-18 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10162-10164) |
2017-12-18 | House | Mr. Dunn moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-12-18 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 352. |
2017-12-18 | House | Reported by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 115-473. |
2017-11-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2017-11-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-11-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. |
2017-11-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3395 (Related) 2018-08-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Education programs funding
Executive agency funding and structure
Executive Office of the President
Higher education
Military personnel and dependents
Research administration and funding
Science and engineering education
Science, technology, communications
Student aid and college costs
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Education programs funding
Executive agency funding and structure
Executive Office of the President
Higher education
Military personnel and dependents
Research administration and funding
Science and engineering education
Science, technology, communications
Student aid and college costs
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation