US HB429 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-10 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-10 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
No Budget, No Pay Act This bill withholds the salaries of Members of a house of Congress that has not agreed to a budget resolution for FY2018 by April 15, 2017, as required by the Congressional Budget Act of 1974. Salaries are withheld from April 16, 2017, until the house of Congress agrees to a budget resolution or the last day of the 115th Congress, whichever is earlier.
Title
No Budget, No Pay Act
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] | Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] | Rep. Barbara Comstock [R-VA] |
Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] |
Rep. Robert Pittenger [R-NC] | Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] |
Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] | Rep. David Young [R-IA] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. Todd Rokita [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2017-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB536 (Related) 2017-01-13 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB98 (Related) 2017-01-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB2153 (Related) 2017-04-26 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB1951 (Related) 2017-04-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HB5214 (Related) 2018-03-08 - Referred to the Committee on the Budget, and in addition to the Committees on Rules, Oversight and Government Reform, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB5465 (Related) 2018-04-10 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SB98 (Related) 2017-01-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB2153 (Related) 2017-04-26 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB1951 (Related) 2017-04-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HB5214 (Related) 2018-03-08 - Referred to the Committee on the Budget, and in addition to the Committees on Rules, Oversight and Government Reform, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB5465 (Related) 2018-04-10 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Subjects
Budget deficits and national debt
Budget process
Congressional oversight
Economics and public finance
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Members of Congress
Budget process
Congressional oversight
Economics and public finance
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Members of Congress
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/429/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr429/BILLS-115hr429ih.pdf |