US HB5465 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
No Budget, No Pay Act This bill withholds the salaries of Members of a house of Congress that has not agreed to a budget resolution for FY2019 by April 15, 2018, as required by the Congressional Budget Act of 1974. Salaries are withheld from April 16, 2018, until the house of Congress agrees to a budget resolution or the last day of the 115th Congress, whichever is earlier.
Title
No Budget, No Pay Act
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Barbara Comstock [R-VA] | Rep. David Young [R-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2018-04-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB429 (Related) 2017-01-10 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB5214 (Related) 2018-03-08 - Referred to the Committee on the Budget, and in addition to the Committees on Rules, Oversight and Government Reform, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB5214 (Related) 2018-03-08 - Referred to the Committee on the Budget, and in addition to the Committees on Rules, Oversight and Government Reform, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Budget deficits and national debt
Budget process
Congressional oversight
Economics and public finance
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Members of Congress
Budget process
Congressional oversight
Economics and public finance
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Members of Congress
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5465/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5465/BILLS-115hr5465ih.pdf |