US HB4244 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Small Business Health Insurance Affordability Act of 2014 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code, with respect to the small employer health care insurance tax credit, to: (1) revise the definition of "eligible small employer" to mean an employer with not more than 50 (currently, 25) full-time employees; (2) increase the employee threshold from 10 to 20 employees for purposes of determining the maximum allowable amount of such credit; (3) eliminate the requirement that employers contribute the same percentage of cost of each employee's health insurance and the cap limiting eligible employer contributions to average premiums paid to a health care exchange; and (4) extend from 2 to 3 consecutive taxable years the period during which an employer may claim such credit. Treats health insurance providing essential health benefits as defined by the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act through a plan not offered through an exchange as a qualified health plan offered through an exchange.
Title
Small Business Health Insurance Affordability Act of 2014
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Rep. Patrick Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1325 (Related) 2013-07-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4128 (Related) 2014-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4132 (Related) 2014-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4133 (Related) 2014-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB2069 (Related) 2014-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4128 (Related) 2014-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4132 (Related) 2014-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4133 (Related) 2014-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB2069 (Related) 2014-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Employee benefits and pensions
Health care costs and insurance
Income tax credits
Small business
Taxation
Wages and earnings
Health care costs and insurance
Income tax credits
Small business
Taxation
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/4244/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr4244/BILLS-113hr4244ih.pdf |