US SB2069 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Small Business Tax Credit Accessibility Act - Expresses the sense of the Senate that the Obama Administration should work to make the small employer health care insurance tax credit more accessible for small employers. Amends the Internal Revenue Code, with respect to the small employer health care insurance tax credit, to: (1) revise the definition of "eligible small employer" to mean an employer with not more than 50 (currently, 25) full-time employees; (2) modify the phaseout formula for such credit to base such phaseout on number of employees and average annual wages; (3) allow a 35% credit in 2014 to small employers who purchase health care coverage outside of the Small Business Health Option Program (SHOP exchange); (4) extend from two to three consecutive taxable years the period during which an employer may claim such credit; (5) eliminate the requirement that employers contribute the same percentage of cost of each employee's health insurance and the cap limiting eligible employer contributions to average premiums paid to a state health insurance exchange; and (6) make such credit available to dependents of a small employer.
Title
Small Business Tax Credit Accessibility Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Begich [D-AK] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. Kay Hagan [D-NC] |
Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D-ND] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] |
Sen. Mary Landrieu [D-LA] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. John Walsh [D-MT] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4128 (Related) 2014-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4132 (Related) 2014-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4133 (Related) 2014-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4244 (Related) 2014-03-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1325 (Related) 2013-07-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4132 (Related) 2014-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4133 (Related) 2014-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4244 (Related) 2014-03-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1325 (Related) 2013-07-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Comprehensive health care
Employee benefits and pensions
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Income tax credits
Small business
Taxation
Wages and earnings
Employee benefits and pensions
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Income tax credits
Small business
Taxation
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/2069/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s2069/BILLS-113s2069is.pdf |