OH SB56 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Passed on June 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-21 - Signed By The Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To enact sections 4731.156 and 4731.157 of the Revised Code to enter into the Interstate Massage Compact (IMpact).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enter the Interstate Massage Compact (IMpact)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-22 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-10 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-21 Signed By The Governor
2024-06-11 Sent To The Governor
2024-05-22HousePassed
2024-01-10HouseReported: Commerce and Labor
2023-09-26HouseReferred to committee: Commerce and Labor
2023-09-18HouseIntroduced
2023-09-13SenatePassed
2023-09-13SenateReported - Substitute: Health
2023-02-22SenateReferred to committee: Health
2023-02-14SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4731156New CodeSee Bill Text
4731157New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/135/sb56
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_135/bills/sb56/IN/00/sb56_00_IN?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_135/bills/sb56/RS/01/sb56_01_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_135/bills/sb56/PS/02/sb56_02_PS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_135/bills/sb56/RH/03/sb56_03_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_135/bills/sb56/PH/04/sb56_04_PH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_135/bills/sb56/EN/05/sb56_05_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=20613&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=20663&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=21346&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=21348&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=21355&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=21356&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=22029&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=22039&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=22418&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=22818&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=22831&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=22859&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/135/sb56/votes

Bill Comments

feedback